LA HB812 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to the Louisiana Crawfish Promotion and Research Board
Title
Makes changes to the Louisiana Crawfish Promotion and Research Board
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Romero [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 812 FINAL PASSAGE (#746) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |