LA HB810 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the organization, duties, and responsibilities of the Dept. of Energy and Natural Resources (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the organization, duties, and responsibilities of the Dept. of Energy and Natural Resources (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 810 FINAL PASSAGE (#661) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2024. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |