LA HB81 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to membership in the Louisiana State Employees' Retirement System and the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana
Title
Provides relative to membership in the Louisiana State Employees' Retirement System and the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2014-01-27 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/27/2014. |
2014-01-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2014-01-24 | House | Prefiled. |