LA HB806 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a Dept. of Education survey of students regarding risk behaviors
Title
Authorizes a Dept. of Education survey of students regarding risk behaviors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 806, FINAL PASSAGE (#894) (Y: 56 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-05-17 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-16 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 29. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-10 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-02 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled. |