LA HB80 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on November 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-12 - Effective date: 12/22/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the use of student assessment results for the 2020-2021 school year with respect to school and district accountability, teacher evaluation, and student promotion (Item #42)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the use of student assessment results for the 2020-2021 school year with respect to school and district accountability, teacher evaluation, and student promotion (Item #42)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-23 - House - House Vote on HB 80 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#267) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-10-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 80 CO-AUTHORS (#228) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-10-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 80 FINAL PASSAGE (#227) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HB 80 FINAL PASSAGE (#106) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-12HouseEffective date: 12/22/2020.
2020-11-12HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 47.
2020-10-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-10-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-10-23HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-10-23HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-10-23HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-23HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-10-23SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-10-21SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-21SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-14SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-10-13HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-12HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20.
2020-10-12HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-12HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-12HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2020-10-05HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=HB80&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190537
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191641
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194464
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1195050
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191275
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191637
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193682
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193338
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194403
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194420
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190538
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191659
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193750
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192346
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194369
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194370

Bill Comments

feedback