LA HB795 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 07/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 07/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the organization of the Tax Exemption Budget (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the organization of the Tax Exemption Budget (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 795 ADOPT (#1333) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 795 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1320) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 795 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#989) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 795 FINAL PASSAGE (#829) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Vote on HB 795 FINAL PASSAGE (#290) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 795 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1320) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 795 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#989) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 795 FINAL PASSAGE (#829) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Vote on HB 795 FINAL PASSAGE (#290) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 592. |
2016-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2016. |
2016-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-06-05 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2016-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2016. |
2016-06-03 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2016-05-25 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Gary Smith, Morrell, and LaFleur. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-05-24 | House | House conferees appointed: Stokes, Abramson, and Davis. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2016-05-24 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2016-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2016. |
2016-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/13/2016. |
2016-04-06 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-05 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |