LA HB791 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective date: July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective date: July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the expenses of the legislature for FY 2015-2016
Title
Makes appropriations for the expenses of the legislature for FY 2015-2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 791 FINAL PASSAGE (#930) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 791 FINAL PASSAGE (#522) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 791 FINAL PASSAGE (#522) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Effective date: July 1, 2015. |
2015-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 76. |
2015-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-08 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 6 for 6/8. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-26 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 1 for 5/27/2015. |
2015-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2015. |
2015-05-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-19 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2015-04-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2015-04-21 | House | Read by title. |