LA HB79 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits corporal punishment for certain students with exceptionalities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits corporal punishment for certain students with exceptionalities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 79 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#798) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 79 FINAL PASSAGE (#614) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 79 FINAL PASSAGE (#130) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16HouseEffective date: 08/01/17.
2017-06-16HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 266.
2017-06-07HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-06HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2017-06-05HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
2017-06-01HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2017-06-01SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-31SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-31SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-30SenateReported with amendments.
2017-05-08SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2017-05-03SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-02HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/02/17.
2017-04-27HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-04-26HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2017-03-21HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2017-03-21HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB79&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1025321
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036001
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049276
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051838
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1052035
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045380
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047527
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049221
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1025330
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036095
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045397
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1056629
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1038054
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047088

Bill Comments

feedback