LA HB785 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a high school student to change his program of study and the type of diploma he is pursuing prior to the beginning of the second semester of his senior year under certain circumstances
Title
Authorizes a high school student to change his program of study and the type of diploma he is pursuing prior to the beginning of the second semester of his senior year under certain circumstances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-02 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HB785 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=779908 |