LA HB775 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the reimbursement of healthcare providers
Title
Provides relative to the reimbursement of healthcare providers
Sponsors
Rep. Paula Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 775 FINAL PASSAGE (#870) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 775 FINAL PASSAGE (#530) (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 775 FINAL PASSAGE (#530) (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 281. |
2018-05-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-23 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/18. |
2018-04-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |