LA HB765 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 94-48-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the "LSU National Champions" specialty license plate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the "LSU National Champions" specialty license plate

Sponsors

Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Reggie Bagala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]
Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]
Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Dewith Carrier [R]Rep. Gary Carter [D]
Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]
Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]
Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]
Rep. Michael Echols [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Kathy Edmonston [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]
Rep. Les Farnum [R]Rep. Gabe Firment [R]Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]
Rep. Larry Frieman [R]Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]
Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. Jonathan Goudeau [R]Rep. Kyle Green [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]
Rep. Charles Henry [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]
Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. John Illg [R]
Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]
Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]
Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Mandie Landry [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]
Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]
Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Danny McCormick [R]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Scott McKnight [R]
Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]
Rep. Buddy Mincey [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]Rep. Richard Nelson [R]
Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Charles Owen [R]Rep. Robert Owen [R]Rep. Tammy Phelps [D]
Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Neil Riser [R]Rep. Troy Romero [R]
Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Larry Selders [D]
Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Phillip Tarver [R]
Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Debbie Villio [R]
Rep. William Wheat [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]Rep. Mark Wright [R]
Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]Sen. Mark Abraham [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]
Sen. Louie Bernard [R]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Joseph Bouie [D]Sen. Troy Carter [D]
Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]Sen. Heather Cloud [R]Sen. Patrick Connick [R]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]
Sen. Michael Fesi [R]Sen. Cleo Fields [D]Sen. Franklin Foil [R]Sen. Jimmy Harris [D]
Sen. Cameron Henry [R]Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Katrina Jackson [D]
Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Patrick McMath [R]
Sen. Barry Milligan [R]Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Robert Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]
Sen. John Morris [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Rogers Pope [R]
Sen. Edward Price [D]Sen. Mike Reese [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Kirk Talbot [R]
Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Mack White [R]Sen. Glen Womack [R]

Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 765 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#726) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 765 FINAL PASSAGE (#537) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 765 FINAL PASSAGE (#289) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-05HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 54.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-28SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-28SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2020-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 104, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-05-22HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2020-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2020-05-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2020-03-31HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB765&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1167839
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173955
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178583
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180266
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171910
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173663
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177054
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178000
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178455
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1167841
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174032
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177239
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177391
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175270
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177543

Bill Comments

feedback