LA HB761 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 29, nays 57. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 29, nays 57. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends criminal penalties for the crime of armed robbery
Title
Amends criminal penalties for the crime of armed robbery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 761 FINAL PASSAGE (#660) (Y: 29 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 29, nays 57. Failed to pass. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported favorably (8-7). |
2018-04-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |