LA HB76 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the magistrate judge position of the 14th JDC
Title
Provides relative to the magistrate judge position of the 14th JDC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-03-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/20. |
2020-03-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-02-14 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/14/2020. |
2020-02-14 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-02-14 | House | Prefiled. |