LA HB76 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Establishes an ad valorem tax exemption for property subject to a cooperative endeavor agreement requiring the property owner to make payments in lieu of taxes (RR SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Establishes an ad valorem tax exemption for property subject to a cooperative endeavor agreement requiring the property owner to make payments in lieu of taxes (RR SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#614) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#511) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#511) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#511) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#511) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2019-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 28. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-28 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2019-05-28 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-23 | House | Notice removed |
2019-05-23 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19. |
2019-05-23 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 40. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2019-05-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. |
2019-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19. |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2019-05-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019. |
2019-03-18 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-18 | House | Prefiled. |