LA HB76 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to special elections for statewide elected offices
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to special elections for statewide elected offices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction. |
2018-02-16 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/16/2018. |
2018-02-16 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-02-15 | House | Prefiled. |