LA HB75 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides qualifications for title insurance producers
Title
Provides qualifications for title insurance producers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 75 FINAL PASSAGE (#463) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 75 FINAL PASSAGE (#231) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 75 FINAL PASSAGE (#231) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-05-08 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 14. |
2024-05-02 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/1/2024. |
2024-05-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2024. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-02-16 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/16/2024. |
2024-02-14 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-02-14 | House | Prefiled. |