LA HB752 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to membership in the Sheriffs' Pension and Relief Fund (EG DECREASE APV)
Title
Provides relative to membership in the Sheriffs' Pension and Relief Fund (EG DECREASE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House Vote on HB 752 FINAL PASSAGE (#465) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2024-03-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |