LA HB748 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB562

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Occupational Licensing Review Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Occupational Licensing Review Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 748 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1318) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 748 FINAL PASSAGE (#1195) (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 748 FINAL PASSAGE (#335) (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-30HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 693.
2018-05-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-17HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-16HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
2018-05-16HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-16SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-11SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-10SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-09SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-04-11SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2018-04-10SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-09HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-09HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-04-05HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/09/18.
2018-04-05HouseNotice given.
2018-04-05HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-03-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18.
2018-03-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-28HouseRead by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 562 reported by the Committee on Commerce (14-0).

Same As/Similar To

HB562 (Replaces) 2018-03-28 - Becomes HB 748.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB748&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080216
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080241
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084525
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098917
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103821
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080461
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084285
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094793
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096342
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097969
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098888
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080218
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080335
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084546
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094869
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1107966
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084474
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097673

Bill Comments

feedback