LA HB741 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-05 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-05 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to collection policy and procedure used by all state agencies (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides with respect to collection policy and procedure used by all state agencies (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 741, FINAL PASSAGE (#1591) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 741, FINAL PASSAGE (#988) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 741, FINAL PASSAGE (#988) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Effective date: August 1, 2012. | |
2012-06-05 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 500. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-06-01 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-01 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-31 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-31 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-30 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-29 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-21 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2012. | |
2012-05-15 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-14 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-02 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled. |