LA HB74 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires schools to provide information relative to influenza and immunization against the influenza virus (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires schools to provide information relative to influenza and immunization against the influenza virus (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 74 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#799) (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 74 FINAL PASSAGE (#663) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 74 AMENDMENT # 3116 BY MILKOVICH HB 74 BY DAVIS (#662) (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote on HB 74 FINAL PASSAGE (#46) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 262.
2018-05-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-09HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/08/18.
2018-05-01HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-23SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-19SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-18SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-03-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-03-19HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/19/18.
2018-03-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-14HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-02-16HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/16/2018.
2018-02-14HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-02-14HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB74&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1063781
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075136
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094488
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099809
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075069
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074481
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088051
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089344
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089504
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088825
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092177
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092556
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092557
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094324
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1063786
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074530
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075232
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075271
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088178
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098739
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076539
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092178

Bill Comments

feedback