LA HB74 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits awarding certain contracts for social services without competitive bid (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Prohibits awarding certain contracts for social services without competitive bid (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2015-03-13 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/13/2015. |
2015-03-09 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2015-03-09 | House | Prefiled. |