LA HB74 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates nomination by legislators of students for free tuition to Tulane University and granting of such free tuition
Title
Eliminates nomination by legislators of students for free tuition to Tulane University and granting of such free tuition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-01-27 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/27/2014. |
2014-01-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-01-23 | House | Prefiled. |