LA HB73 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a 10% reduction of all state professional, personal, and consulting service contracts (RE DECREASE See Note)
Title
Provides for a 10% reduction of all state professional, personal, and consulting service contracts (RE DECREASE See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 73 FINAL PASSAGE (#478) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2013. |
2013-05-14 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-03-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2013. |
2013-02-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-02-25 | House | Prefiled. |