LA HB727 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 53-9-2)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to unauthorized entry of and criminal damage to a critical infrastructure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to unauthorized entry of and criminal damage to a critical infrastructure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 727 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1126) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 727 FINAL PASSAGE (#891) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 727 AMENDMENT # 3494 BY MILLS HB 727 BY THIBAUT (#890) (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - House Vote on HB 727 FINAL PASSAGE (#408) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Vote on HB 727 FINAL PASSAGE (#408) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-30HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 692.
2018-05-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18.
2018-05-08HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-08SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-26SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-25SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-24SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2018-04-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-12HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/12/18.
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-05HouseReported favorably (16-0).
2018-03-27HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-03-26HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB727&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078897
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083430
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086173
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097619
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103820
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086028
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085739
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083835
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089585
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090365
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1091395
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1091827
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093715
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094426
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095437
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097564
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078899
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083668
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086269
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089657
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1106524
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086120
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086204
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094433

Bill Comments

feedback