LA HB72 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the legislative auditor to access data from the Department of Revenue for the purpose of auditing state-operated or state-administered programs (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the legislative auditor to access data from the Department of Revenue for the purpose of auditing state-operated or state-administered programs (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 72 FINAL PASSAGE (#380) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-16HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
2019-05-07HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-06HouseReported with amendments (11-3).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-04-08HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
2019-03-18HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-18HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB72&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1115686
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131546
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135136
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130811
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131370
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134789
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1115690
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130979
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131665
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131802
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135168
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137543
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135126

Bill Comments

feedback