LA HB72 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adds additional substances to Schedule I of the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Adds additional substances to Schedule I of the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 72 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#923) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 72 FINAL PASSAGE (#751) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 72 FINAL PASSAGE (#48) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 72 FINAL PASSAGE (#751) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 72 FINAL PASSAGE (#48) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Effective date: July 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 373. |
2015-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/27/2015. |
2015-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2015-03-13 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/13/2015. |
2015-03-09 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2015-03-09 | House | Prefiled. |