LA HB718 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to hunting and fishing licenses for nonresident veterans, retired military personnel, and Purple Heart recipients
Title
Provides relative to hunting and fishing licenses for nonresident veterans, retired military personnel, and Purple Heart recipients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 718 CO-AUTHORS (#778) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 718 FINAL PASSAGE (#777) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 718 FINAL PASSAGE (#456) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 718 FINAL PASSAGE (#456) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 718 FINAL PASSAGE (#777) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 718 FINAL PASSAGE (#456) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 718 FINAL PASSAGE (#456) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2022-05-31 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 229. |
2022-05-26 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-24 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-23 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |