LA HB712 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to group insurance premiums for retirees of the Caddo Parish Sheriff's Office

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to group insurance premiums for retirees of the Caddo Parish Sheriff's Office

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 712 FINAL PASSAGE (#626) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 712 FINAL PASSAGE (#331) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 140.
2018-05-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-02HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-01HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-04-30SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-26SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-25SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-24SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-11SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2018-04-10SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-09HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/09/18.
2018-04-02HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-29HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2018-03-21HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2018-03-20HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback