LA HB710 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB229
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 06/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 06/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the chief of police in the village of Dodson
Title
Provides relative to the chief of police in the village of Dodson
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 710 FINAL PASSAGE (#833) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 710 FINAL PASSAGE (#596) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 710 FINAL PASSAGE (#596) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | Effective date: 06/14/2021. |
2021-06-14 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 358. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-20 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-17 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 229 reported by the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs (12-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB229 (Replaces) 2021-05-17 - Becomes HB 710.