LA HB71 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-30 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-30 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires law enforcement officers to check for compliance with the compulsory security law during traffic stops
Title
Requires law enforcement officers to check for compliance with the compulsory security law during traffic stops
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 71 FINAL PASSAGE (#688) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 71 FINAL PASSAGE (#75) (Y: 47 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 71 FINAL PASSAGE (#75) (Y: 47 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Notice given. |
2013-04-23 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2013-04-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 43. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. |
2013-04-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/22/2013. |
2013-04-17 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported favorably (9-5) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2013-03-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2013. |
2013-02-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2013-02-25 | House | Prefiled. |