LA HB705 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 49. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 49. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to additional medical examinations
Title
Provides relative to additional medical examinations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 705 FINAL PASSAGE (#715) (Y: 41 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 49. Failed to pass. |
2022-05-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2022. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported with amendments (9-3-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |