LA HB701 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the licensing and regulation of virtual currency businesses (EN +$148,869 SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the licensing and regulation of virtual currency businesses (EN +$148,869 SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 701 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#723) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 701 FINAL PASSAGE (#590) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 701 HB 701 BY WRIGHT (#234) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-13HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 341.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-28SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-28SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-27SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2020-05-27SenateSenate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2020-05-27SenateRules suspended.
2020-05-27SenateReported with amendments.
2020-05-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2020-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-20HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-05-20HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-13HouseReported favorably (15-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB701&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164283
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170979
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174779
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178872
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182592
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171349
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174708
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175828
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176678
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177545
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178173
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178211
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178447
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164287
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170832
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171222
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172472
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174821
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174853
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176382
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179201
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174726
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177809

Bill Comments

feedback