LA HB70 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to indigent defense services in certain city courts (EG NO IMPACT LF See Note)
Title
Provides relative to indigent defense services in certain city courts (EG NO IMPACT LF See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 70 FINAL PASSAGE (#335) (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably (11-2). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-03-15 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2019. |
2019-03-15 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-03-15 | House | Prefiled. |