LA HB697 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB628

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for sports wagering (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for sports wagering (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 697 FINAL PASSAGE (#424) (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 697 FINAL PASSAGE (#335) (Y: 78 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04HouseEffective date: See Act.
2021-06-04HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 80.
2021-05-26HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-05-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-05-24HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-20HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-19SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-18SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-17SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2021-05-12SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2021-05-11SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-10HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 24. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-10HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-05HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
2021-05-05HouseNotice given.
2021-05-05HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-29HouseDischarged from the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-04-26HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-04-22HouseRead by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 628 reported by the Committee on Ways and Means (16-0).

Same As/Similar To

HB628 (Replaces) 2021-04-22 - Becomes HB 697.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB697&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216262
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216467
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222904
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227012
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232717
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216773
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220073
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216263
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216725
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223080
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224519
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236024
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222886
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226864

Bill Comments

feedback