LA HB692 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the membership of the board of directors of the Research Park Corporation
Title
Provides relative to the membership of the board of directors of the Research Park Corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 692, FINAL PASSAGE (#466) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-04-23 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-19 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-12 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/19/2012. | |
2012-04-12 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-11 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-01 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled. |