LA HB690 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 01/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 01/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for coverage for subsequent preventive tests for certain individuals diagnosed with breast cancer
Title
Provides for coverage for subsequent preventive tests for certain individuals diagnosed with breast cancer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 690 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1124) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 690 CO-AUTHORS (#862) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 690 FINAL PASSAGE (#861) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 690 FINAL PASSAGE (#296) (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 690 CO-AUTHORS (#862) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 690 FINAL PASSAGE (#861) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 690 FINAL PASSAGE (#296) (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Effective date: 01/01/2019. |
2018-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 461. |
2018-05-17 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18. |
2018-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |