LA HB69 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To provide for a sales and use tax rebate on the sale of certain fiber-optic cable equipment (Item #31) (EN -$750,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide for a sales and use tax rebate on the sale of certain fiber-optic cable equipment (Item #31) (EN -$750,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on HB 69 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#149) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#131) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Vote on HB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#76) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-29HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-29HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-06-28HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/29/20.
2020-06-28HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-25SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-24SenateReported with amendments.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-06-19SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-06-18HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/18/20.
2020-06-16HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-15HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2020-06-11HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB69&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181665
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182162
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182991
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184797
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181881
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182115
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182247
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182922
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183399
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183921
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184213
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184518
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184755
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181666
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182047
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182228
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182535
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183020
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183573
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183931
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185442
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182969
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184405

Bill Comments

feedback