LA HB69 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 06/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 06/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the membership of the Louisiana State Board of Dentistry
Title
Provides relative to the membership of the Louisiana State Board of Dentistry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 69 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#642) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#434) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#159) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#434) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#159) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Effective date: 06/11/2019. |
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 324. |
2019-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-21 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-15 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2019. |
2019-03-14 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-14 | House | Prefiled. |