LA HB689 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB466
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date: 06/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date: 06/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to credit unions
Title
Provides relative to credit unions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 689 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#469) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 689 FINAL PASSAGE (#336) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 689 FINAL PASSAGE (#69) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 689 FINAL PASSAGE (#336) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 689 FINAL PASSAGE (#69) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | House | Effective date: 06/01/2021. |
2021-06-01 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 34. |
2021-05-26 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-19 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-17 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2021-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021. |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-04-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2021. |
2021-04-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-21 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 466 reported by the Committee on Commerce (13-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB466 (Replaces) 2021-04-21 - Becomes HB 689.