LA HB689 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the operations of public colleges and universities (RE INCREASE SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the operations of public colleges and universities (RE INCREASE SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 689 FINAL PASSAGE (#136) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-29SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended.
2020-05-28SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-28SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-21SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-15HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback