LA HB686 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB530
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the Louisiana-Headquartered Motion Picture Production Cooperative Endeavor Program (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the Louisiana-Headquartered Motion Picture Production Cooperative Endeavor Program (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 686 FINAL PASSAGE (#483) (Y: 81 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17. |
2017-05-23 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2017-05-17 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-05-16 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 530 reported by the Committee on Appropriations (16-0). Recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB530 (Replaces) 2017-05-16 - Becomes HB 686.