LA HB685 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to foreign insurers
Title
Provides relative to foreign insurers
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Simon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 685 FINAL PASSAGE (#680) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 685 FINAL PASSAGE (#447) (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 685 FINAL PASSAGE (#447) (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2015. |
2015-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 224. |
2015-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2015-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015. |
2015-05-14 | House | Notice given. |
2015-05-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2015. |
2015-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |