LA HB683 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to life safety and property protection and conveyance device mechanic licenses (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to life safety and property protection and conveyance device mechanic licenses (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Kenny Cox [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 683 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#659) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 683 FINAL PASSAGE (#351) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 683 HB 683 BY COX (#171) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 683 FINAL PASSAGE (#351) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 683 HB 683 BY COX (#171) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-13 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2020-06-13 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 339. |
2020-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-05-27 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20. |
2020-05-27 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 7. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-15 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2020-03-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/20. |
2020-03-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-03-16 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-03-16 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2020-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2020-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |