LA HB682 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Senate conference committee members appointed: Ward, Talbot, and Cathey.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to reserves for insurers (REF INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to reserves for insurers (REF INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 682 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#658) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 682 FINAL PASSAGE (#390) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 682 AMENDMENT # 2063 BY WARD HB 682 BY FRIEMAN (#389) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 682 HB 682 BY FRIEMAN (#85) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Ward, Talbot, and Cathey.
2020-06-01HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-05-31SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-05-31SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-05-31HouseHouse conferees appointed: Frieman, Brown, and Seabaugh.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-05-27HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-27HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-27SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-21SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-20SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB682&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164167
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169504
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173309
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169898
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172469
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176391
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176547
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176781
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177551
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178255
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164172
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169798
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173331
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172912
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176548

Bill Comments

feedback