LA HB682 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 05/15/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to elections of alcoholic beverages propositions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to elections of alcoholic beverages propositions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 682 FINAL PASSAGE (#949) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 682 FINAL PASSAGE (#371) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseEffective date: 05/15/2018.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 334.
2018-05-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-09SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-07SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-03SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-02SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-11HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/11/18.
2018-04-05HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-04HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB682&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073251
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082902
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085706
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095088
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100463
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082797
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081975
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084731
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073269
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083176
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085725
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085533
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095032

Bill Comments

feedback