LA HB680 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB426
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective date: 01/01/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective date: 01/01/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to child support when a parent is incarcerated
Title
Provides relative to child support when a parent is incarcerated
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 680 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#898) (Y: 59 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 680 FINAL PASSAGE (#841) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 680 FINAL PASSAGE (#827) (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 680 FINAL PASSAGE (#585) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 680 FINAL PASSAGE (#841) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 680 FINAL PASSAGE (#827) (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 680 FINAL PASSAGE (#585) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | House | Effective date: 01/01/19. |
2017-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 264. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 59, nays 26, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-06 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/17. |
2017-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 15 yeas and 11 nays. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/17. |
2017-05-31 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-30 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17. |
2017-05-25 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17. |
2017-05-18 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17. |
2017-05-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 426 reported by the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure (6-0-1). |
Same As/Similar To
HB426 (Replaces) 2017-05-10 - Becomes HB 680.