LA HB678 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB479
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to prenatal neglect and reporting thereof
Title
Provides relative to prenatal neglect and reporting thereof
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 678 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#855) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 678 FINAL PASSAGE (#798) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 678 FINAL PASSAGE (#297) (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 678 FINAL PASSAGE (#798) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 678 FINAL PASSAGE (#297) (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2017-06-22 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 359. |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/17. |
2017-05-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-03 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 479 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (11-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB479 (Replaces) 2017-05-03 - Becomes HB 678.