LA HB678 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 10/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 10/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the assessment of a surcharge fee on prepaid 911 services (EN +$6,120,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the assessment of a surcharge fee on prepaid 911 services (EN +$6,120,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 678 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1338) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 678 ADOPT (#1348) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 678 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1316) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 678 FINAL PASSAGE (#1159) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 678 FINAL PASSAGE (#385) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 678 ADOPT (#1348) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 678 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1316) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 678 FINAL PASSAGE (#1159) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 678 FINAL PASSAGE (#385) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 10/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 590. |
2016-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/8/2016. |
2016-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2016-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-06-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2016. |
2016-06-05 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2016-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Luneau, Morrell, and Martiny. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2016-06-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Carmody, Adams, and Broadwater. |
2016-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2016-06-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2016. |
2016-06-03 | House | Notice given. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016. |
2016-04-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |