LA HB677 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB558
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires ignition interlock devices as a condition of obtaining restrictive driver's licenses
Title
Requires ignition interlock devices as a condition of obtaining restrictive driver's licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 677 FINAL PASSAGE (#283) (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17. |
2017-05-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-02 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 558 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works (12-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB558 (Replaces) 2017-05-02 - Becomes HB 677.