LA HB677 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-02 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 57. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-02 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 57. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriations for Fiscal Year 2012-2013
Title
Makes supplemental appropriations for Fiscal Year 2012-2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 677 AMENDMENT # 4022 BY EDWARDS MOTION TO ADOPT (#741) (Y: 64 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 677 AMENDMENT # 4046 BY ARMES MOTION TO ADOPT (#740) (Y: 35 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 677 AMENDMENT # 3701 BY FANNIN MOTION TO ADOPT (#739) (Y: 53 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 677 FINAL PASSAGE (#743) (Y: 45 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 677 AMENDMENT # 4061 BY HARRISON MOTION TO ADOPT (#742) (Y: 48 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 677 FINAL PASSAGE (#571) (Y: 51 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 677 AMENDMENT # 4046 BY ARMES MOTION TO ADOPT (#740) (Y: 35 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 677 AMENDMENT # 3701 BY FANNIN MOTION TO ADOPT (#739) (Y: 53 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 677 FINAL PASSAGE (#743) (Y: 45 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 677 AMENDMENT # 4061 BY HARRISON MOTION TO ADOPT (#742) (Y: 48 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 677 FINAL PASSAGE (#571) (Y: 51 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 57. Failed to pass. |
2013-06-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2013. |
2013-05-30 | House | Notice given. |
2013-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2013. |
2013-05-29 | House | Notice given. |
2013-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Notice given. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013. |
2013-05-23 | House | Notice given. |
2013-05-23 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2013-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 36. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. |
2013-05-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2013. |
2013-05-21 | House | Notice given. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-07 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 4 for 5/9/2013. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-04-15 | House | Read by title. |